EMPATHY FOR SPECIAL CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empathy for special children works to reduce the social isolation and improve the lives of those growing up with ASD/High Functioning Disability/Additional Needs and their families. Working throughout Shropshire we provide a wide range of safe, supported opportunities to allow children and families to create an empathic social network, try something new, re engage with society and be more active.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 02 April 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cherida Marie Hughes | Chair | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dhieb | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Perkins | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.50k | £91.49k | £77.50k | £71.08k | £69.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.97k | £86.63k | £78.32k | £84.75k | £59.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.40k | £14.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 May 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 05 May 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE 2. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING WITH A HIGH FUNCTIONING DISABILITY/ADDITIONAL NEEDS, PARTICULARLY THOSE AFFECTED BY THE TRIAD OF IMPAIRMENT OF AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY BY: A. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THESE CHILDREN / YOUNG PEOPLE TO IMPROVE AND PRACTICE THEIR SOCIAL INTERACTION AND COMMUNICATION SKILLS AND ESTABLISH A PEER GROUP, B. PROVIDING AGE APPROPRIATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO TRY NEW ACTIVITIES AND INTEGRATE WITH LOCAL MAINSTREAM PROVIDERS IN SUPPORTED, SAFE, AND UNDERSTANDING ENVIRONMENT, C. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF HIGH FUNCTIONING DISABILITIES WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION, D. TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF FAMILIES, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER BY PROVIDING A FORUM FOR FAMILIES TO MEET AND INTRODUCTION TO SUPPORT SERVICES AND INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Empathy For Special Children
Corvedale Road
CRAVEN ARMS
Shropshire
SY7 9ND
- Phone:
- 07495947987
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window