THE MONMOUTH SCHOOLS' CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's aim is to enhance and substantially support means-tested places and capital improvements at the Haberdashers' Schools in Monmouth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 19 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MSCT Trustee Limited | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.31k | £286.51k | £221.93k | £90.17k | £211.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.56k | £156.46k | £85.45k | £73.22k | £99.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 FEB 2013 as amended on 08 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE SCHOOLS FROM TIME TO TIME OPERATED PURSUANT TO THE SCHEME AND SUCH OTHER SCHOOLS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES (THE "SCHOOLS") AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH OR OTHERWISE ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOLS AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING: GRANT FUNDING TO THE SCHOOLS FOR THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES AND/OR DIRECT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PUPILS AND PROSPECTIVE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOLS; FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PUPILS AT THE SCHOOLS; AND OTHER FORMS OF GRANT FUNDING TO THE SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Monmouth School
Almshouse Street
Monmouth
NP25 3XP
- Phone:
- 01600710406
- Email:
- development@habsmonmouth.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window