EUROPA PTA

Charity number: 1154223
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £48,484
Total expenditure: £40,265

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ESUK PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosamunde Catriona Bosse Chitty Chair 11 January 2023
None on record
Celine Grand Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Sally Louise Povolotsky Trustee 18 March 2024
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF WILLIAM MALTHUS
Received: On time
WILLIAM MALTHUS CHARITY FOR THE NEEDY
Received: On time
EAST HENDRED COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Maria Frantzeskaki Trustee 11 January 2023
None on record
Steven Derek Wright Trustee 07 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £30.17k £35.36k £38.65k £41.40k £48.48k
Total expenditure £26.65k £24.04k £18.65k £26.95k £40.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 September 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 September 2024 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 July 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 July 2023 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 July 2023 391 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 July 2023 391 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 April 2022 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 April 2022 278 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 January 2021 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 April 2021 282 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Europa School UK
Thame Lane
Culham
Abingdon
OX14 3DZ
Phone:
01235 524060