Accounts and annual returns EALING ELDERLY RESIDENTS' CHARITY

Charity number: 1151998
Charity reporting is overdue by 1538 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 442 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 442 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 808 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 808 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1173 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1173 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1538 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1538 days