Financial history THE NINA LOUISE SPREADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/09/2020 15/09/2021 15/09/2022 15/09/2023 15/09/2024
Total gross income £5.15k £4.65k £6.03k £7.09k £21.44k
Total expenditure £12.17k £9.15k £9.85k £17.04k £17.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A