Financial history STREET FOOTBALL WALES (SFW)

Charity number: 1152799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £96.85k £116.04k £197.06k £93.26k £112.77k
Total expenditure £118.30k £75.99k £89.66k £127.01k £147.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A