Financial history CHRIST CHURCH WOODLEY (METHODIST & UNITED REFORMED CHURCH)

Charity number: 1152991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £90.80k £79.63k £104.52k £107.57k £114.67k
Total expenditure £138.60k £119.45k £150.70k £94.97k £136.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A