Financial history ASTON STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1152067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.88m £2.48m £3.54m £3.29m £3.74m
Total expenditure £2.74m £2.24m £3.14m £3.58m £4.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £98.67k £86.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.74m £1.73m £2.19m £1.87m £2.13m
Income - Other trading activities £52.44k £25.37k £1.23m £99.23k £63.03k
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £693.30k £74.43k £1.27m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £735 £48 £408 £6.89k £8.09k
Income - Other £42.19k £26.30k £42.42k £45.26k £203.81k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.74m £2.24m £3.14m £3.58m £4.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.19k £19.95k £23.01k £24.80k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0