CROSBY RAVENSWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
film nights. vintage vehicle festival, themed lunches eg soups & sweets, pies &puddings, highlights rural touring productions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 11 November 1974: Standard registration
- (CROSBY) VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAZEL AGNES BLENKINSHIP | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Gwyneth Timson | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary JeanEwin Wood | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
derek Raine | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
john stuart smith | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNN BARNES | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARRY RICHARD BRASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.32k | £12.59k | £12.69k | £7.55k | £10.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.88k | £3.60k | £8.82k | £8.40k | £10.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £120 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 AUGUST 1974
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CROSBY RAVENSWORTH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CROSBY RAVENSWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ivy Cottage
Crosby Ravensworth
Penrith
CA10 3JP
- Phone:
- 01931715381
- Email:
- freda.smith5@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window