THE CENTRE FOR ADOPTION SUPPORT AND EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for Adoption Support and Education's purpose is to provide tailored and specific high quality, innovative services, activities and resources that support and make a difference to those affected by adoption and permanency: adopted or fostered children and families and professionals who work with adoption and permanence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.34k | £85.54k | £235.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.54k | £79.77k | £202.43k | £60.80k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £16.32k | £118.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 07 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 08 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/08/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR MAY BE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PART OF SOCIETY BY REASON OF BEING ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR MAY BE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PART OF SOCIETY BY REASON OF COMING FROM BROKEN OR DAMAGED HOMES AND HAVE BEEN OR MAY BE ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE BY: A) PROMOTING THE RELIEF AND CARE OF CHILDREN WITHOUT FAMILIES OR PARENTS ABLE TO MEET THEIR NEEDS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE AND FUTURE OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. B) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO ADOPTIVE PARENTS, CARERS, GUARDIANS AND PROFESSIONALS ABOUT ALL ADOPTION RELATED ISSUES C) ALLEVIATING THE EFFECTS OF EARLY LIFE TRAUMA AND BEREAVEMENTS ON ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR CHILD IN CARE D) ENCOURAGING HEALTHY ATTACHMENTS AND FAMILY BONDING IN ADOPTIVE AND FOSTER FAMILIES E) PROMOTING GREATER EDUCATION AND SOCIAL INCLUSION OF ADOPTED, FOSTERED AND CHILDREN IN CARE SO THEY ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL F) PROVIDING GUIDANCE SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING TO ADOPTED CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH THE AIM OF RELIEVING DISTRESS RESULTING FROM THE IMPACT OF ADOPTION ON THEIR LIVES. 3. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO: A) CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE, HAVE BEEN, ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE; B) INDIVIDUALS OF ANY AGE WHO WERE ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR IN CARE; AND C) ADOPTIVE PARENTS, FOSTER CARERS, OR MEMBERS OF FAMILIES WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN INVOLVED IN PROVIDING ADOPTIVE OR FOSTER FAMILIES. 4. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY CHAMPIONING BEST PRACTICE IN RELATION TO THE PROVISION OF ADOPTION, FOSTERING OR CARE SERVICES AND BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ALL THOSE WHO MAY BE INVOLVED IN THE ADOPTION, FOSTERING AND CARE PROCESS INCLUDING: A) LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND CHILDREN’S (AND OTHER) CHARITIES ACTIVE IN THIS AREA; B) SOCIAL WORKERS AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS WORKING IN THE AREAS OF CHILD CARE AND SOCIAL INCLUSION; C) FAMILIES WHO ARE CONSIDERING OR HAVE ADOPTED OR FOSTERED; AND D) INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window