Accounts and annual returns FELLOWSHIP CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1152060
Charity reporting is overdue by 1163 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 432 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 432 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 798 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 798 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1163 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1163 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 March 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required