Accounts and annual returns THE AUSTRALIA DAY FOUNDATION UK TRUST

Charity Number: 1153770
Charity reporting is up to date (189 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 04 February 2025 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 04 February 2025 189 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 11 January 2024 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 11 January 2024 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 December 2022 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 02 December 2022 125 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window