Financial history SOUTH MANCHESTER MUSLIM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1153535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £180.27k £112.54k £195.67k £245.06k £386.39k
Total expenditure £58.08k £26.15k £43.28k £64.77k £149.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A