Governing document CANTERBURY FOOD BANK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Sep 2013 as amended on 02 May 2018 as amended on 25 Jul 2022 as amended on 31 Oct 2024 as amended on 02 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship in the Canterbury City Council district (as defined at the date of this constitution) in particular but not exclusively by: i) The provision of emergency food parcels together with other related supplies, along with items, services and facilities connected with the preparation and serving of emergency food supplies to individuals and family groups in financial crisis; ii) To provide financial support with domestic energy costs for those individuals and families in need; and iii) To campaign on issues to prevent or relieve poverty that include, but are not limited to, initiating and running projects solely, or contributing to, or cooperating with, charities, other organisations, and the media.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.