Financial history The PCC of the Ecclesiastical parish of Peasedown St John and Foxcote with Shoscombe

Charity Number: 1154122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £216.97k £262.36k £287.48k £343.89k £399.61k
Total expenditure £235.63k £263.67k £296.85k £308.93k £383.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A