Financial history ST. CUTHBERT'S OLD SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity number: 1153838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.38k £95.91k £86.96k £104.06k £109.89k
Total expenditure £106.04k £106.04k £94.03k £100.36k £113.50k
Income from government contracts N/A £95.91k £77.11k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £90.05k N/A N/A £87.71k £90.20k