Financial history END VIOLENCE AGAINST WOMEN COALITION

Charity Number: 1161132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £350.24k £701.12k £561.30k £505.31k £652.43k
Total expenditure £353.42k £625.62k £455.71k £576.50k £543.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £78.55k £71.41k £52.28k £648.19k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £3.93k £3.86k £1.05k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £17 £1.07k £3.19k
Income - Other N/A £622.57k £485.95k £448.10k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £617.76k £451.51k £536.83k £517.24k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £7.86k £4.20k £39.67k £25.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £11.84k £7.86k £16.96k £10.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0