Financial history Sidmouth Hospice at Home

Charity number: 1153338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £219.02k £596.74k £261.41k £1.14m £1.20m
Total expenditure £507.96k £515.40k £642.44k £754.77k £869.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £4.26k N/A
Income from government grants £845 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £527.33k N/A £1.06m £1.03m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £5.55k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £4.26k £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £69.41k N/A £74.32k £82.46k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £80.00k
Income - Legacies N/A £478.89k N/A £850.67k £894.42k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £495.09k N/A £737.41k £853.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £20.30k N/A £17.36k £16.37k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £44.20k N/A £44.08k £52.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £20.30k N/A £17.36k £16.37k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £73