Financial history TETHERDOWN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1155180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £176 £452 £795 £1.42k £1.60k
Total expenditure £2.57k £15.45k £1.13k £5.06k £1.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A