SUFFOLK PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to ensure that the distinctive character of Suffolk's built environment, coastline and landscape is protected. Where change is proposed the society will use its expertise and resources to play a proactive role in all the relevant processes so as to ensure that change is undertaken sympathetically and to the highest standards of design and sustainability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 29 November 2013: CIO registration
- 12 August 2015: Funds received from 249981 SUFFOLK PRESERVATION SOCIETY
- SPS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT TOWNSHEND | Chair | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KARL DEBENHAM | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIR GUY RAYMOND CUTHBERT QUILTER | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Oliver Seymour | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Sturgis | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE WARD | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOIS HUNT | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.81k | £196.81k | £110.58k | £102.00k | £51.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.00k | £118.00k | £119.05k | £153.00k | £123.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Nov 2013 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF SUFFOLK’S PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENSURING ANY CHANGE IS UNDERTAKEN SYMPATHETICALLY AND TO THE HIGHEST LEVEL OF DESIGN AND SUSTAINABILITY POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUFFOLK PRESERVATION SOCIETY
LITTLE HALL
MARKET PLACE
LAVENHAM
SUDBURY
CO10 9QZ
- Phone:
- 01787247179
- Email:
- sps@suffolksociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window