THE PAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN WITH ST MARTIN, YORK

Charity number: 1153456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of religion through the provision at both churches of regular services of worship and other activities as authorised by the Church of England. Church of England activities are available to all members of the public. The churches are kept open to facilitate private prayer on most days.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £68,305
Total expenditure: £60,086

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 2013: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST HELEN WITH ST MARTIN PCC, YORK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Kingsley Garth Boulton Trustee 06 January 2024
THE SHELDON HUTCHINSON TRUST
Received: On time
Wanda Elizabeth Manley GSM Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Trevor Richard Julian Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Rev Nicole Dominique Marie Gladstone Trustee 26 June 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST OLAVE WITH ST GILES, YORK
Received: On time
Patrick Jonathan Yeo Marshall Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Reverend Canon Elizabeth Claire Hassall Trustee 15 December 2020
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST OLAVE WITH ST GILES, YORK
Received: On time
BARKER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Christine Ann Hardaker Trustee 31 October 2020
None on record
Anthony John Hammersley Trustee 15 August 2013
FRIENDS OF THE YORK ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST FOR EXCAVATION AND RESEARCH
Received: On time
THE PARISH ESTATE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.04k £54.15k £26.11k £43.69k £68.31k
Total expenditure £62.39k £52.34k £46.97k £38.59k £60.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.51k £643 £966 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 MAPLEHURST AVENUE
YORK
YO31 8JA
Phone:
01904636512
Email:
No information available