Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HILLSIDE

Charity number: 1153663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £75.57k £81.65k £92.09k £123.57k £88.53k
Total expenditure £78.87k £71.16k £80.25k £133.49k £90.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £10.57k £500 N/A N/A