Financial history PURPLE SHOOTS BUSINESS LENDING LTD

Charity Number: 1155385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £574.00k £158.05k £696.62k £647.42k £702.55k
Total expenditure £328.97k £325.25k £603.05k £643.10k £664.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £24.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £534.37k N/A £624.66k £553.20k £586.84k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £5.69k £3.45k £2.97k
Income - Charitable activities £31.24k N/A £66.28k £90.78k £112.73k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £8.39k N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £285.08k N/A £548.49k £585.17k £594.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.45k N/A £54.56k £57.92k £70.34k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £1.46k £1.54k £1.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £89.87k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £27.44k N/A £0 £0 £0