Financial history AFC WIMBLEDON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £366.98k £847.18k £994.41k £1.08m £826.63k
Total expenditure £337.74k £630.13k £850.85k £1.31m £796.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.80k £101.24k £84.80k £123.13k £136.64k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £358.24k £313.06k £275.36k £175.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £56.01k £99.58k £134.33k £70.37k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £432.88k £581.63k £665.65k £580.39k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £5 £136 £48 £33
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £629.06k £785.03k £866.84k £701.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.07k £65.82k £87.98k £95.36k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £8.63k £8.37k £10.41k £11.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £14.40k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £357.80k £0