Financial history KIELDER OBSERVATORY ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1153570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £597.21k £546.43k £735.75k £903.74k £799.48k
Total expenditure £613.47k £584.34k £713.49k £817.42k £818.28k
Income from government contracts £76.82k £42.58k £46.19k £45.36k N/A
Income from government grants £77.79k £89.96k £27.26k £2.87k £3.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £272.77k £291.19k £199.20k £290.90k £109.32k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £315.56k £254.98k £513.73k £611.14k £681.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £583 £258 £56 £1.69k £3.39k
Income - Other £8.30k £0 £22.78k £0 £5.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £609.35k £566.04k £694.25k £795.48k £791.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.12k £18.30k £19.24k £21.94k £26.54k
Expenditure - Governance £8.34k £7.36k £6.31k £6.66k £8.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0