Trustees INSTITUTE OF HEALTH PROMOTION AND EDUCATION
Charity number: 1156738

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Frances Burrage | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
claire Cotter | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|||||
John Paul Wright | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Holly Blake | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Penny | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
elvis enowbeyang tarkang | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Whittingham | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Palmer | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
angela towers | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
anne Whitcombe | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
michelle baybutt | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Theaker | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL CRAIG WATSON | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA JEAN CHEATER MBE | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.