Financial history LIA RELIEF TRUST

Charity number: 1156537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.31m £2.11m £1.82m £2.91m £3.94m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.90m £897.77k £2.76m £2.57m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.31m £2.11m £1.82m £2.91m £3.94m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.44m £1.87m £842.06k £2.71m £2.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.86k £29.66k £55.70k £50.05k £114.17k
Expenditure - Governance £3.60k £4.56k £26.28k £169.81k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.32m £1.78m £722.81k £2.54m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £304 £0 £1.46k £2.99k