Financial history GLOW CHURCH UK

Charity number: 1154239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £893.47k £753.24k £887.95k £1.02m £997.95k
Total expenditure £828.40k £770.76k £829.06k £1.04m £977.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £142.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £339.17k £221.80k £281.47k £321.62k £313.68k
Income - Other trading activities £411.70k £374.66k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £142.60k £156.78k £606.47k £570.47k £613.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £16 £382
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £123.68k £70.17k
Income - Legacies £0 £2.52k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £467.86k £470.11k £724.32k £762.96k £757.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £190.32k £300.64k £55.47k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.81k £0 £6.12k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £170.22k £0 £49.27k £280.36k £220.17k