GLOW CHURCH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides nursery care and hire of facilities that advance public education by mounting lectures, exhibitions, conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£997,952
Donations and legacies | £313.68k | |
Charitable activities | £613.72k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £382 | |
Other | £70.17k |
Total expenditure:
£977,960
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £757.79k | |
Other | £220.17k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £220.17k | |
Charitable expenditure | £757.79k | |
Retained for future use | £19.99k |
People

47 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 October 2013: Standard registration
- XCEL COUNTY DURHAM (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Warren Gordon Eriksson | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Peter Edward Duffew | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sarah Glassbrook | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Cherrie | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felix Clack | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven William Mawston | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £893.47k | £753.24k | £887.95k | £1.02m | £997.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £828.40k | £770.76k | £829.06k | £1.04m | £977.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £142.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £339.17k | £221.80k | £281.47k | £321.62k | £313.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £411.70k | £374.66k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £142.60k | £156.78k | £606.47k | £570.47k | £613.72k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16 | £382 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £123.68k | £70.17k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.52k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £467.86k | £470.11k | £724.32k | £762.96k | £757.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £190.32k | £300.64k | £55.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.81k | £0 | £6.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £170.22k | £0 | £49.27k | £280.36k | £220.17k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.03m | £2.02m | £2.02m | £2.14m | £2.11m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £23.91k | £22.31k | £21.37k | £72.63k | £147.32k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.21m | £1.22m | £1.16m | £1.36m | £1.38m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 SEP 2013 as amended on 08 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ("THE OBJECTS"): 1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glow Uk
Long Tens Way
Aycliffe Business Park
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 6AP
- Phone:
- 01325329500
- Email:
- info.uk@glowchurch.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window