Financial history BRIDGNORTH COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1154617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £87.44k £105.63k £95.62k £141.88k £126.31k
Total expenditure £77.77k £93.42k £116.57k £119.82k £112.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.61k £5.29k N/A £3.50k N/A