Financial history JUBILEE CHURCH CIO

Charity number: 1154108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £131.27k £134.10k £108.31k £95.11k £118.87k
Total expenditure £116.40k £111.86k £119.07k £120.88k £145.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A