LONDON PARKS AND GREEN SPACES FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Forum exists to ensure that London's green infrastructure continues to thrive now and into the future, enabling the people who plan, design and manage London's parks and green spaces to share knowledge and experience, maintain and improve quality, maximise services and benefits and get the most from available resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 March 2014: Standard registration
- LPGSF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL JOHN THORNE | Chair | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Stephen Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Caleb MELL | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Chloe Elizabeth Evans Kane | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ulrika Madeleine Hogberg | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Dolapo Mariam Oladini | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Beth Daniels | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bernie Watson | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Brown | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.80k | £186.91k | £214.31k | £228.47k | £193.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.14k | £134.86k | £201.81k | £276.30k | £242.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £50.00k | £84.61k | £78.75k | £6.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF PARKS AND GREEN OPEN SPACES IN GREATER LONDON IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE AN UMBRELLA GROUP FOR OTHER INTERESTED ORGANISATIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAPEL MANOR COLLEGE
BULLSMOOR LANE
ENFIELD
EN1 4RQ
- Phone:
- 07748968579
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window