THE GALLIPOLI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit by raising public awareness of the Gallipoli Campaign of 1915 and by encouraging and facilitating the study in the legacy and lessons of that Campaign, keeping alive the memory of the Campaign and ensuring that all who fought or served in it, and those who gave their lives, are not forgotten by applying such means as the Trustees deem fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 February 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIGADIER JAMES STOPFORD | Chair | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Warren Thomas Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
HESTER MOIRA HUTTENBACH | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Irene Carter | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Iredale | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Luff | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHAMBERS | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.07k | £114.48k | £31.00k | £32.31k | £39.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.05k | £21.00k | £24.40k | £55.40k | £54.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE GALLIPOLI CAMPAIGN OF 1915 AND BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THE STUDY IN THE LEGACY AND LESSONS OF THAT CAMPAIGN, KEEPING ALIVE THE MEMORY OF THE CAMPAIGN AND ENSURING THAT ALL WHO FOUGHT OR SERVED IN IT, AND THOSE WHO GAVE THEIR LIVES, ARE NOT FORGOTTEN BY APPLYING SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Monomarks Ltd
Monomark House
27 Old Gloucester Street
London
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 01384 270185
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window