Financial history THE STONDON SINGERS

Charity number: 1154435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.39k £5.17k £5.66k £7.78k £10.89k
Total expenditure £5.22k £4.96k £7.85k £9.18k £11.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A