Financial history KAG ADVOCACY CIO

Charity number: 1154696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £150.80k £125.00k £129.00k £173.56k £154.20k
Total expenditure £164.12k £119.00k £139.00k £171.64k £159.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.87k
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £90.00k £134.87k £12.95k