Financial history THE MERIDIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1155297
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £498.21k £551.83k £589.90k £506.21k £552.23k
Total expenditure £465.49k £444.40k £584.78k £599.39k £593.56k
Income from government contracts £76.89k £44.12k £153.07k £134.15k £200.41k
Income from government grants £1.32k £21.75k £8.61k £16.91k £67.46k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £485.40k £415.67k £496.23k £534.92k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £261 £20 £0 £2.44k
Income - Other N/A £295 £12.53k £9.98k £14.87k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £444.40k £584.78k £599.39k £593.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.46k £4.33k £1.52k £6.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0