Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF UPPER COQUETDALE

Charity number: 1157319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £85.42k £97.39k £91.33k £94.34k £94.43k
Total expenditure £87.75k £89.31k £77.82k £84.90k £80.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £11.00k N/A £705 N/A