Financial history THE GODOLPHIN CHARITABLE TRUSTS

Charity number: 1156706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £14.08k £12.44k £14.07k £5.99k £18.20k
Total expenditure £22.61k £10.43k £5.13k £7.38k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A