Financial history BRITISH DRESSAGE

Charity number: 1155352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.84m £3.42m £4.16m £4.83m £5.16m
Total expenditure £4.63m £3.33m £3.98m £4.60m £5.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £155.32k £30.61k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £132.01k £0 £125.74k £158.34k £174.24k
Income - Other trading activities £326.18k £268.32k £313.66k £359.83k £404.86k
Income - Charitable activities £4.36m £2.99m £3.69m £4.27m £4.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.74k £8.06k £3.17k £34.40k £122.84k
Income - Other £251 £155.32k £30.61k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.45m £3.17m £3.82m £4.43m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £180.18k £164.09k £153.29k £170.02k £198.64k
Expenditure - Governance £37.17k £23.96k £30.61k £34.74k £51.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £2.16k £4.18k £5.85k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0