Governing document BRITISH DRESSAGE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/2013 as amended on 20 Sep 2018 as amended on 20 Oct 2020 as amended on 12 Oct 2021 as amended on 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION, AS THE GOVERNING BODY OF THE SPORT OF DRESSAGE IN GREAT BRITAIN, OF PARTICIPATION BY PERSONS IN GREAT BRITAIN (BOTH ABLE-BODIED AND WITH ANY FORM OF DISABILITY) IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN DRESSAGE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.