Accounts and annual returns STERLING DENTAL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1157644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 December 2024 331 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 26 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 26 November 2022 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 March 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required