Financial history STERLING DENTAL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1157644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.13k £1.64k £395 £3.11k £0
Total expenditure £17.11k £682 £254 £3.20k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A