Financial history 25TH BIRMINGHAM 1ST BEECHES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.20k £29.40k £15.09k £4.66k £3.35k
Total expenditure £21.15k £10.12k £7.11k £5.16k £8.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.04k £10.67k N/A N/A