Financial history GLOUCESTERSHIRE RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE CENTRE

Charity number: 1155902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £476.49k £743.22k £698.18k £726.46k £689.01k
Total expenditure £441.53k £517.97k £618.64k £652.92k £693.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £56.33k N/A
Income from government grants £372.25k £104.62k £31.75k £558.17k £518.21k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £29.21k £21.65k £16.16k £54.23k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £675.78k £707.92k £624.51k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £2.38k £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £753 £0 £10.28k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £0 £615.52k £652.88k £691.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £3.12k £43 £1.53k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £171
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £517.97k £0 £0 £0