Governance DIAL WEST CHESHIRE
Charity number: 1156120

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 11 March 2014: Standard registration
- 03 July 2014: Funds received from 518908 DIAL HOUSE CHESTER
- 07 November 2018: Funds received from 1111570 DISABLED INFORMATION AND WELFARE RIGHTS CENTRE DIC...
- 22 October 2019: Funds received from 1123915 VALE ROYAL DISABILITY SERVICES
- 09 January 2024: Funds received from 1198535 WEST CHESHIRE AUTISM HUB
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.