Trustees DIAL WEST CHESHIRE

Charity number: 1156120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER JAMES PATRICK DEVINE Chair 09 January 2014
None on record
Yvette Isabella Thorman Trustee 07 May 2025
None on record
Jacqueline Davis Trustee 28 June 2022
None on record
Susan Povah Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Paul Donald Cooper Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
PATRICIA BELL Trustee 09 January 2014
None on record