ROCK FIRE RAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The company's principal activity during the year continued to be internet evangelism and local outreach meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- New Zealand
Governance
- 07 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE ESTELLE HENSHALL MA FIA | Chair | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL DAY | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR WILLIAM STEPHEN MUGFORD | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.30k | £290 | £750 | £500 | £9.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.60k | £451 | £509 | £513 | £9.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING BELOW IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED “THE TRUSTEES”) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. STATEMENT OF BELIEFS 4.1.1.1 THERE IS ONLY ON TRUE GOD WHO IS THE ETERNAL KING, CREATOR AND REDEEMER OF ALL THAT IS. HE IS ONE BEING IN THREE PERSONS: GOD THE FATHER, GOD THE SON AND GOD THE HOLY SPIRIT. 4.1.1.2 THERE IS ONE LORD JESUS CHRIST, THE ONLY SON OF GOD, ETERNALLY BEGOTTEN OF THE FATHER, GOD FROM GOD, LIGHT FROM LIGHT, TRUE GOD FROM TRUE GOD, BEGOTTEN, NOT MADE, OF ONE BEING WITH THE FATHER; THROUGH HIM ALL THINGS WERE MADE. FOR US AND FOR OUR SALVATION HE CAME DOWN FROM HEAVEN, WAS INCARNATE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND THE VIRGIN MARY AND WAS MADE MAN. FOR OUR SAKE HE WAS CRUCIFIED UNDER PONTIUS PILATE; HE SUFFERED DEATH AND WAS BURIED. ON THE THIRD DAY HE ROSE AGAIN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCRIPTURES; HE ASCENDED INTO HEAVEN AND IS SEATED AT THE RIGHT HAND OF THE FATHER. HE WILL COME AGAIN IN GLORY TO JUDGE THE LIVING AND THE DEAD AND HIS KINGDOM WITH HAVE NO END. 4.1.1.3 THE HOLY SPIRIT, THE LORD, THE GIVER OF LIFE, PROCEEDS FROM THE FATHER AND THE SON AND WITH THE FATHER AND THE SON IS WORSHIPPED AND GLORIFIED. HE HAS SPOKEN THROUGH THE PROPHETS. THE BAPTISM OF THE HOLY SPIRIT ACCORDING TO ACTS 1:4-8 AND 2:4 IS POURED OUT ON CHRISTIANS THAT THEY MIGHT HAVE THE POWER TO BE WITNESSES. 4.1.1.4 THE BIBLE IS THE ONLY DIVINELY INSPIRED AND INFALLIBLE, AUTHORITATIVE WORD OF GOD. 4.1.1.5 HUMANKIND WAS CREATED IN THE IMAGE OF GOD TO KNOW AND ENJOY HIM, YET WE WILFULLY REJECTED THE LORDSHIP AND GLORY OF GOD FOR WHICH WE WERE INTENDED. BECAUSE OF THIS, SICKNESS, DEATH AND JUDGEMENT ENTERED THE WORLD AND NOW CREATION EXPERIENCES THE EFFECTS AND CONSEQUENCES OF SIN. 4.1.1.6 WE ARE SAVED BY GOD?S GRACE, THROUGH FAITH IN THE PERSON AND WORK OF JESUS CHRIST. ANYONE CAN BE RESTORED TO FELLOWSHIP WITH GOD THROUGH REPENTING, BELIEVING AND RECEIVING JESUS AS THEIR SAVIOUR AND LORD. 4.1.1.7 HEAVEN AND HELL ARE REAL PLACES; EACH HUMAN SPIRIT WILL GO TO ONE OR THE OTHER AFTER DEATH. 4.1.1.8 THE VICTORIOUS REDEMPTIVE WORK OF CHRIST ON THE CROSS PROVIDES FREEDOM FROM THE POWER OF THE DEVIL, SIN, SICKNESS AND TORMENT. 4.1.1.9 THE CHURCH CONSISTS OF ALL WHO PUT THEIR FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST. HE GAVE HIS CHURCH THE ORDINANCES OF BAPTISM AND COMMUNION - THERE IS ONE BAPTISM FOR THE FORGIVENESS OF SINS. 4.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 07595039912
- Email:
- info@rockfirerain.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window