CITY CHURCH BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
City Church currently meets on two sites each Sunday morning to worship God and expound the bible. Both sites run children's activities. The church runs groups for worship, prayer and bible study, a youth group, coffee mornings, and holds services in a local retirement home. Various training courses are run periodically. The church is also involved in the StreetLife project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£641,465
Donations and legacies | £623.81k | |
Charitable activities | £16.98k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £431 | |
Other | £248 |
Total expenditure:
£541,291
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £541.29k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £541.29k | |
Retained for future use | £100.17k |
People

9 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- BRIDGE COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- BRIDGE COMMUNITY CHURCH BRISTOL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS DAVID TODD | Chair | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LLoyd Maynard | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Donne-Davis | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gillian Evens | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Dalziel | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £521.41k | £492.32k | £441.21k | £542.74k | £641.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £430.22k | £413.37k | £367.11k | £454.30k | £541.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £501.59k | N/A | N/A | £521.94k | £623.81k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £18.14k | N/A | N/A | £18.69k | £16.98k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £57 | N/A | N/A | £5 | £431 | |
|
Income - Other | £1.62k | N/A | N/A | £2.10k | £248 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £430.22k | N/A | N/A | £454.30k | £541.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | £4.76k | £4.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £22.08k | £54.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.37k | N/A | N/A | £6.11k | £3.65k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £216.49k | N/A | N/A | £474.59k | £567.29k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.17k | N/A | N/A | £27.40k | £17.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 15 APR 2014 AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN BRISTOL AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE:- 4.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CIO; 4.2. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY; AND 4.3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
Fenton Court
1-3 Fenton Road
BRISTOL
BS7 8ND
- Phone:
- 01179243322
- Email:
- office@citychurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window