JOHN POINTON SPORTS AND RECREATION FACILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, provide and/or assist in the provision of facilities for the benefit of the inhabitants of Cheddleton and the surrounding area for sport, recreation or other leisure time occupation of the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life of the said inhabitants and in particular by provision of a sports and recreation centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 10 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM FRANK CUNNINGHAM | Chair | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PHILIP WORTHINGTON | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|||||
TONY LACEY | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BAILEY | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARNABY KYFFIN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.32k | £145.31k | £42.25k | £49.31k | £50.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.55k | £79.32k | £83.90k | £69.44k | £86.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2025 | 380 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2025 | 380 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 DEC 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE, AND/OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHEDDLETON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVISION OF A SPORTS AND RECREATION CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingston House
Greenway Hall Road
Stockton Brook
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST9 9PW
- Phone:
- 01782550115
- Email:
- Manager@pointonpark.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window