Financial history INDIGO VOLUNTEERS

Charity number: 1158459
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £122.53k £129.89k £86.89k £91.17k £51.51k
Total expenditure £95.90k £131.61k £90.84k £93.94k £74.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A